HI HB2656 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a maximum time period to grant or deny a business or development-related permit, license, or approval shall only apply if a request for a contested case has not been filed.
Title
Relating To Administrative Procedure.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3226 (Same As) 2024-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2656&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2656_.HTM |