HI HB2670 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires and appropriates funds for the Department of Agriculture to create a local produce dollar-for-dollar matching program for beneficiaries of the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 9:45AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 9:45AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:45AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 9:45AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Green, English Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Creagan, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to HHS, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 760) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3664) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from AEN/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3043) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Wakai. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 1:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HMS, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 370). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1104-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 02-09-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-31 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 13 |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2398 (Same As) 2018-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Agriculture
Local Healthy Food Incentive Program
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Department of Agriculture
Local Healthy Food Incentive Program
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program