HI HB2682 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the agricultural technology transfer and workforce development program and provides for a coordinator position to provide support for secondary agricultural education and Future Farmers of America programs. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Workforce Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to AEN/LCA, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 270). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 356-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |