HI HB2697 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Act 052, 06/22/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1152).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Act 052, 06/22/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1152).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Veterans' Services to organize, coordinate, and conduct a biennial Hawaii Veterans Summit. Appropriates funds. (HB2697 CD1)
Title
Relating To Veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Act 052, 06/22/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1152). |
2018-06-25 | House | Act 052, on 06/22/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1152). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 111-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 111-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Ito; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:05PM in conference room 016. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 1:05PM in conference room 016. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 831). |
2018-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; Ihara. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: LoPresti, Fukumoto Co-Chairs; Ito, Ward. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 766) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3645) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2963) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 122). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 856-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 738-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2018-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-15-18 10:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-02-06 | House | Re-referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2018-02-05 | House | Recommitted to VMI with none voting no and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused. |
2018-02-05 | House | Recommends recommittal to VMI. |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 66-18) as amended in HD 1. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-01-18 10:00AM in conference room 429. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to VMI, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |