HI HB2698 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 199, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 691).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 199, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 691).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Director of DCCA to promote and encourage telework in conjunction with broadband services and appropriates moneys from the Compliance Resolution Fund for these activities; Establishes a Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance Advisory Council; Establishes a work group to develop streamlined permitting procedures for development of broadband services or technology; Requires DCCA to report annually to the Legislature on expenditures of federal moneys for broadband facilities, services, equipment, or contracts. (HB2698 CD1)
Title
Technology; Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance; Advisory Council; Federal Moneys
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 199, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 691). | |
2010-07-07 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 199, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 453). | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 152-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 152-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kim, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wakai, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-10 at 7:30 pm in Conference Room 309. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-10 at 5:00 PM in Conference Room 423. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-10 at 4:00pm in Conference Room 423. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-10 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-10 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-10 2:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-15 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-19-10 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-15-10 9:30AM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-13-10 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Wakai, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ward. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Kim, Co-Chair(s); Ige, Slom. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 471) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3036) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2777) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT will hold a public decision making on 03-17-10 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-08-10 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 218). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 643-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-25 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-10 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3). | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from EBM/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 395-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Belatti, Cabanilla, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Mizuno. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wakai, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Takai, Wooley. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM/CPC on Wednesday, 02-03-10 2:30pm in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to EBM/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |