HI HB2700 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for host families of foreign exchange students, fellows, and interns. Effective 7/1/2018. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2018. (HB2700 HD1)
Title
Relating To International Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2018-02-05 | House | Recommitted to VMI with none voting no and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused. |
2018-02-05 | House | Recommends recommittal to VMI. |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 64-18) as amended in HD 1. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-01-18 10:00AM in conference room 429. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to VMI, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |