HI HB2700 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning January 1, 2022, requires all residential dwellings that are serviced by gas utilities to be constructed with gas detection systems installed. Requires sellers of residential real property to provide notice of the potential hazards of gas appliances.
Title
Relating To Gas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on EEP/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HSG on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:45AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP/HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2700&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2700_.HTM |