HI HB2709 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to ETT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to ETT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Hawaii Innovation and Technology Research Corporation and transfers the rights, powers, functions, duties, and employees of the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation and the Hawaii Strategic Development Corporation to the Hawaii Innovation and Technology Research Corporation. (HB2709 HD2)
Title
Relating To Technology.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 374). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1129-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole. |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:35PM in conference room 308. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 615-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-13-18 9:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 117-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Holt; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-02-18 8:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EDB, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism ($)
Hawaii Innovation and Technology Research Corporation
Hawaii Innovation and Technology Research Corporation