HI HB2723 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a pedestrian from crossing a street, road, or highway while using a mobile electronic device. (HB2723 HD1)
Title
Statewide Traffic Code; Mobile Electronic Devices; Pedestrians
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] |
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 536-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-17 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Takayama, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takumi. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-16 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-10-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |