HI HB274 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds for the redevelopment of HPHA administrative offices and the creation of public housing and affordable rental housing, and the redevelopment of Kuhio Homes, Kuhio Park Terrace Low Rise, and Mayor Wright Homes properties.
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; General Obligation Bonds; Affordable Housing ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=274&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB274_.HTM |