HI HB274 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB274
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning January 1, 2024, requires agencies to maintain a website with a list of open contested cases that are not confidential by law; provide access to documents filed that are not confidential by law; and establish a subscription-based email notification system that notifies interested parties of all filings made in a contested case proceeding. (HB274 HD2)
Title
Relating To Administrative Procedure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 586) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Morikawa. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 23) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-29-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB274 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
SB757 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
SB757 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).