HI HB2748 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes statewide vehicular law enforcement pursuit policies. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3124) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Awa. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-24 3:02PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TCA, JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 444). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Garcia, Holt, Kila, Kong, Lamosao, Matsumoto, Miyake, Pierick, Ward voting no (11) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1056-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-22 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ilagan, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Holt; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Kong, Souza. |
2024-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-22-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 464-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-13 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Evslin, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila. |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 02-13-24 11:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |