HI HB298 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB298
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes any government agency to engage in the wheeling of electricity that is produced at its own facilities from renewable energy resources, subject to disallowance by the Public Utilities Commission. Designates the Natural Energy Laboratory of Hawaii Authority as a microgrid demonstration project. Authorizes the Public Utilities Commission to allow wheeling within the boundaries of the Hawaii Ocean Science and Technology Park. (HB298 HD1)
Title
Relating To Intra-governmental Wheeling.
Sponsors
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPH. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 157). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1053), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-11 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 34) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB298 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to EET, CPH.