HI HB304 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - (S) Act 215, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - (S) Act 215, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from the general fund to provide grants for public health, welfare, and education. Effective July 1, 2012. (HB304 CD1)
Title
State Finances; Public Health, Welfare, and Education; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | (S) Act 215, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318). | |
2012-07-06 | (H) Act 215, on 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318). | |
2012-05-07 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-05-04 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 728). | |
2012-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 839). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Solomon . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 153-12). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 153-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-30 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-30 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, Yamane, Mizuno, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-29 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-30-12 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 4:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-27-12 12:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 686). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, HLT, HUS, EDN, referral sheet 73 | |
2012-04-26 | (H) House conferees appointed: Oshiro, Yamane, Mizuno, Takumi Co-Chairs; Ward. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 758). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Chun Oakland, Co-Chair(s); Kidani. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 514) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3205) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Fukunaga, Kim. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-12 8:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 40). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen voting no (3) and Representative(s) Chang excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Marumoto, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Wooley excused (2). | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 727-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-26 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-29-12 11:30AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |