HI HB304 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB304
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the conditions under which the definition of "enter or remain unlawfully" shall apply with reference to criminal trespass in the second degree.
Title
Relating To Criminal Trespass.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB304 (Carry Over) 2017-02-24 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=304&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB304_.HTM |