HI HB304 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB304
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the posting of depth gauge signs, in a manner consistent with the Federal Highway Administration's Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, on any portion of a public highway that lies within a special flood hazard area and is prone to flooding. Appropriation. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 3). |
2020-02-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-02-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 8) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-10-20. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2416) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-04-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1316) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 10:45AM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 364). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1201) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 291) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB304 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.