HI HB314 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Re-Referred to PSM/WTL/GVO, CPN.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Re-Referred to PSM/WTL/GVO, CPN.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of: (1) Any advertising device or billboard erected, placed, or maintained upon a county office building if erected, placed, or maintained by authority of the county agency, department, or officer; and (2) Any outdoor advertising device displayed with the authorization of the Stadium Authority on the exterior of any stadium operated by the Stadium Authority. (HB314 HD1)
Title
State and County Buildings; Outdoor Advertising Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/WTL/GVO, CPN. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL, CPN. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 173). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Matsumoto, Pouha, Thielen, Ward voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Oshiro, Pouha, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 634) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Keohokalole, Tokioka, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |