HI HB322 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB322
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to DOH for FY 2017-2018 to purchase an ambulance vehicle and for the costs of operating a 24-hour, 7-days-a-week, ambulance unit for the County of Kauai.
Title
Making An Appropriation For Emergency Medical Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-02-17 at 8:30AM. |
2017-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-31-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB322 (Carry Over) 2017-02-02 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=322&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB322_.HTM |