HI HB330 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB330
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a fee for selling sugar-sweetened beverages at the distributor level to be collected by the Department of Health. Establishes a special fund into which revenues are deposited. Establishes a trust fund in the private sector to receive revenues from the special fund. Establishes a healthy ohana committee to advise the department on the administration of the trust fund. Makes appropriations.
Title
Relating To Sugar-sweetened Beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB541 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB330 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB330 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=330&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB330_.HTM |