HI HB333 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the terms of holdover HCDA members from 3/1/2015, to the adjournment sine die of the 2015 regular session of the legislature to ensure the fulfillment of quorum requirements during the transitioning of HCDA membership pursuant to Act 61, SLH 2014.
Title
HCDA; Membership; Transition
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=333&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB333_.HTM |