HI HB338 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB338
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special number plates to commemorate Carissa Kainani Moore.
Title
Relating To Special Number Plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB338 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB117 (Same As) 2023-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB117 (Same As) 2023-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=338&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB338_.HTM |