HI HB347 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB347
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires owners of multiple parking facilities within any county of the State who aggregate the required parking spaces for electric vehicles to aggregate the spaces within that same county. Requires a parking space equipped with an electric vehicle charging system and required to be accessible to remain accessible when aggregated. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicle Charging Systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1). |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 308) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2023-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:45AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB370 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
HB347 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1).
HB347 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=347&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB347_HD1_.HTM |