HI HB377 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB377
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires building permit applicants to provide to the county a certificate of liability insurance issued by a workers' compensation insurance carrier or a self-insurance authorization, or a signed declaration verifying an exemption from coverage, for the applicants and their subcontractors as a prerequisite for the issuance of any building permit. Requires building permit holders to file a signed declaration verifying workers' compensation coverage, self-insurance authorization, or exemption from coverage or insurance requirements for any subcontractor hired after issuance of the permit. Requires coordinated communication between county building permitting agencies and the Director of Labor and Industrial Relations to ensure compliance. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 955) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 30). |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 742), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Tokioka, Tupola. |
2017-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 391) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB377 (Carry Over) 2017-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
SB1131 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to JDL/PSM.
SB1131 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to JDL/PSM.