HI HB382 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notification of pending class action against the State to the Governor, President of the Senate, and Speaker of the House prior to the filing of a lawsuit. Requires service of the complaint, together with supporting and exculpatory materials, to the Senate President and House Speaker within seven days of filing. Effective January 1, 2046. (HB382 HD1)
Title
State Tort Liability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 111). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Belatti, Ching, Finnegan, Marumoto, Rhoads voting no (5) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Berg, Finnegan, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Herkes, Luke, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Carroll, McKelvey, Morita, Wakai, Thielen. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-24-09 2:05pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 18 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |