HI HB387 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB387
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the shipment of tobacco products, and the transport of tobacco products ordered or purchased through a remote sale, to anyone other than a licensee. Increases the license fee for wholesalers or dealers and the retail tobacco permit fee. Increases the excise tax for each cigarette sold, used, or possessed by a wholesaler or dealer. Increases the excise tax on the wholesale price of each article or item of tobacco products sold by the wholesaler or dealer. (HB387 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 183) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB387 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Department of the Attorney General
Excise Tax
License
Permit
Tax
Unlawful Shipment and Transport of Tobacco Products
Excise Tax
License
Permit
Tax
Unlawful Shipment and Transport of Tobacco Products