HI HB387 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB387
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides police officers who become members of the ERS after 6/30/2023 with retirement benefits similar to those provided for members of the ERS who became members before 7/1/2012, including but not limited to calculation of retirement allowance, minimum age or years of credited service requirements, and vesting period. Allows retired police officers hired after 6/30/01 to be treated as if employment began before 7/1/01 in order to maintain spousal health benefits.
Title
Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB387 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB1158 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17
SB1158 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17
Subjects
Employees' Retirement System
Medical Coverage
Minimum Age
Police Officers
Retirement
Spousal Benefits
Years of Credited Service
Medical Coverage
Minimum Age
Police Officers
Retirement
Spousal Benefits
Years of Credited Service
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=387&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB387_.HTM |