HI HB440 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 3:30PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 3:30PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to DLNR for land and natural resource projects related to watershed management plans; equipment for fire, natural disaster, and emergency response; and forest and outdoor recreation improvement. Effective 07/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Forest Conservation and Access; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-27 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-28-15 1:10PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Galuteria, Riviere, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Evans, Pouha. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 535) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1456) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ruderman. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1026) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-15 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 185). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 846) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 208), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-09-15 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |