HI HB451 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB451
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation for the operational expenses and staffing costs of the Hawaii Association of Conservation Districts. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Association Of Conservation Districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1241) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 45). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 859), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from WLH/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 597) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH/EEP on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB451 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.