HI HB461 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 092, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 092, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers OIP from LG to DAGS. Clarifies the independence of OIP as an administratively attached agency. Clarifies the employment status of OIP attorneys and the civil service exemption for OIP personnel. (HB461 CD1)
Title
OIP; LG; DAGS; Transfer; Administrative Attachment; Attorneys; Civil Service ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | Act 092, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192). |
2015-06-10 | House | Act 092, on 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 153). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 153) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2015-04-30 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-27 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-28-15 4:30PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Gabbard, Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Johanson, Pouha. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 539) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1458) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 930) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 46). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Souki excused (2). |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 582), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB472 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30