HI HB463 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB463
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP/TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP/TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sets the goal of employing one hundred percent clean ground transportation for the public and private transportation sectors by December 31, 2030. Requires all light duty motor vehicles procured pursuant to the Hawaii Public Procurement Code to be powered by renewable sources by January 1, 2030. Accelerates the State's goal of becoming one hundred percent reliant on clean energy and reaching its zero emissions clean energy target to 2030. Increases the goal for electricity use reductions achieved under the State's energy-efficiency portfolio standards. Prohibits the sale of new motor vehicles powered solely by fossil fuels by January 1, 2030.
Title
Relating To Climate Change.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP/TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB463 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP/TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=463&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB463_.HTM |