HI HB465 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB465
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the boating special fund. Transfers unencumbered boating special fund moneys and future revenues to the general fund.
Title
Relating To The Boating Special Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB465 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=465&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB465_.HTM |