HI HB483 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-24 - (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-24 - (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants advanced public health nurses recognition as advanced practice registered nurses as of 10/01/2011.
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses; Qualifications
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB37 (Same As) 2011-02-09 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=483 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB483_.HTM |