HI HB521 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB521
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a certified ocularist, certified by a nationally recognized ocularistry certifying board, may perform duties within the scope of that certification. (HB521 HD1)
Title
Relating To Ocularists.
Sponsors
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Val Okimoto [R] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from IAC/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 503) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama, McDermott. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC/CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:01PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-01 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on IAC/CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen, Todd, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 9), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to IAC/CPC. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, IAC/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB225 (Same As)
HB521 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
HB521 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).