HI HB522 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes a technical amendment to the law on incentives and service awards allowed to employees who contribute to the improvement of government services.
Title
Government Operations; Incentive and Service Awards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 19 |
2015-02-17 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-17-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |