HI HB542 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB542
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows bidders to clarify or correct immaterial or technical information required as part of a bid submission for up to twenty-four hours after the bid submission deadline. Requires that bids for construction be opened no sooner than twenty-four hours after the deadline for the submission of bids. Defines "immaterial or technical information". Repeals 6/30/2026. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-16 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-16-23 3:00PM; CR 225. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 58). |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-02-21 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 03-02-23. |
2023-02-21 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 784) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-16 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1). |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 314) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Alcos; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB542 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=542&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB542_HD2_.HTM |