HI HB574 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB574
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals language authorizing the DOE to retain federal disaster relief funds. Amends the major disaster fund to be a special fund. Requires federal disaster relief funds to lapse to the general fund if not expended within five years. Shortens the time for reporting the purpose of any allotment or expenditure of fund moneys. Repeals language requiring unspent funds to be rolled over. Requires annual reports to the legislature on federal disaster relief funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Disaster Relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, LoPresti, Perruso, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1). |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 123) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2021-02-01 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-04-21 8:30AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by PDP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to PDP, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB574 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.