HI HB596 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB596
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Liquor Commission to record all complaints against any licensee, regardless of whether the complaint is filed during or after the occurrence of the violation. Requires the Liquor Commission to review the history of complaints against any applicant at the time of application for a new license or renewal of an existing license.
Title
Relating To Intoxicating Liquor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-09-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB596 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB14 (Same As) 2023-02-14 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
SB14 (Same As) 2023-02-14 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=596&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB596_.HTM |