HI HB604 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB604
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to implement a vision zero program in Hawaii by 7/1/2022. Establishes a goal of no traffic fatalities or serious injuries by 2030.
Title
Relating To Vision Zero.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB287 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB604 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB604 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=604&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB604_.HTM |