HI HB618 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a renewable fuels production refundable tax credit for the production of fuel-grade renewable fuels using less than one barrel of oil per ton. Repeals the ethanol facility tax credit. Applies to the period from July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2020. (HB618 HD1)
Title
Tax Credit; Renewable Fuels Production
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 532) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2015-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB349 (Same As)