HI HB621 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB621
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the instream use of water for commercial kalo cultivation conducted in a manner consistent with traditional and customary practices of Native Hawaiians from the existing process for the disposition of water rights.
Title
Relating To The Disposition Of Water Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB735 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
HB621 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
HB621 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=621&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB621_.HTM |