HI HB630 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB630
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Glass Container Recovery Program. (HB630 HD1)
Title
Relating To Glass Container Recovery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 03-13-19 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 207). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1130), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from EEP/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 302) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/EDB on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:40AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-29 | House | Re-referred to EEP/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB630 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.