HI HB65 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB65
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of fines that may be assessed against a noncandidate committee for violations of organizational report requirements. Increases the amount of fines that may be assessed against noncandidate committees for violations of advertisement disclosure requirements. Increases the fines for advertisements paid by noncandidate committees making only independent expenditures.
Title
Relating To Campaign Finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-13 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=65&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB65_.HTM |