HI HB664 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB664
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes discriminatory requirements for mandatory insurance coverage of in vitro fertilization procedures to create parity of coverage for same-sex couples, unmarried women, and male-female couples for whom male infertility is the relevant factor.
Title
Relating To In Vitro Fertilization Insurance Coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-09-17 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-17 at 11:30AM. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-17 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-17 at 10:00AM. |
2017-01-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-02-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB664 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB502 (Same As) 2017-04-21 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
SB502 (Same As) 2017-04-21 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=664&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB664_.HTM |