HI HB679 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB679
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of Hawaiian home lands to digitize its applicant, beneficiary, and lessee records. Requires that the digital database be completed and available for use no later than July 1, 2022.
Title
Relating To Native Hawaiian Beneficiaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB679 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=679&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB679_.HTM |