HI HB691 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB691
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes financial exploitation of an elder by a caregiver a Class A felony.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB691 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 5
SB531 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SB531 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=691&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB691_.HTM |