HI HB70 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the return-to-home program to assist eligible homeless individuals return to their home state if there is a support network available and the support network is able to receive them. Appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2030. (SD1)
Title
Homeless; Return-to-Home Program; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 650). | |
2012-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, Mizuno, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Pine. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Senate Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 548). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 4:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 675). | |
2011-04-25 | (H) House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Kawakami as Co-Chairs.. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Cabanilla Co-Chairs. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-25-11 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-11 4:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Fukunaga, Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, Mizuno, Chong Co-Chairs; Pine. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Re-referred to HSG, HUS, FIN, referral sheet 58 | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 427) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Green, Kim). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1087) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Tokuda. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 897) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-18-11 11:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-11 1:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 42). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, C. Lee voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 788) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Coffman. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-11 1:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Cabanilla, Chang, Coffman, Har, Ito, Pine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Chong, Carroll, Herkes, Morita, Nakashima. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-16-11 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Re-referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HSG/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |