HI HB709 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB709
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Hawaii State Constitution to allow a recount of votes cast at an election to be conducted in a manner as provided by the Legislature. Effective 01/28/2081. (SD1)
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article Ii Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 2). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 773) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1971) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1283) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | House | Notice of a bill proposing constitutional amendment in the form of (HD 1) transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 213). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 968), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5). |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 341) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Yamane, Thielen. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB709 (Carry Over) 2019-04-16 - Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 2).
SB842 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
SB842 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.