HI HB726 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB726
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state and county elected officials from soliciting and accepting campaign contributions during any regular session or special session of the state legislature, including any extension of any regular session or special session and any legislative recess days, holidays, and weekends.
Title
Relating To Campaign Contributions.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 179). |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 804), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-22 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Kong. |
2023-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Campaign Contributions
Commission to Improve Standards of Conduct
County Elected Officials
Legislative Sessions
Prohibition
State Elected Officials
Commission to Improve Standards of Conduct
County Elected Officials
Legislative Sessions
Prohibition
State Elected Officials
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=726&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB726_.HTM |