HI HB729 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows charter schools to use appropriated funds for facilities improvement, rental, and construction and other infrastructure improvements. Appropriates funds for facilities and infrastructure improvement.
Title
Relating To Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB912 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB729 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB729 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=729&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB729_.HTM |