HI HB736 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates capital improvement project funds for the planning, design, and construction of a shared-use pathway along the mauka side of Kahekili Highway. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB736 HD2)
Title
Kahekili Highway; Shared-use Pathway; Capital Improvement Project; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee on TIA deferred the measure. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 1:16PM in conference room 224. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to TIA, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 203). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 869-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 470) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-11-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |